Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyn Văn D, S.D.B.

Bishop of Thi Binh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1946 BornTri Buu
15 Aug 196519.5ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Dec 197327.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
29 Nov 200559.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
29 Nov 200559.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
18 Jan 200660.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
25 Jul 200963.5AppointedBishop of Thi Binh, Viet Nam
9 Sep 200963.6InstalledBishop of Thi Binh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyn Văn D:
Bishop Pierre Nguyn Văn D S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Thi Binh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Thi Binh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,040
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015