Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Coltelli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Adramyttium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1865BornSan Pietro di Bagno
1880¹14.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
26 Feb 190034.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
26 Feb 190034.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
17 Jun 190034.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adramyttium
28 Jan 190135.5DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clemente Coltelli:
Bishop Clemente Coltelli O.F.M. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 76
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013