Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Vincent Eugène Bossilkov (Bossilkoff), C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1900Born
18 Apr 191918.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
23 Apr 192322.4Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Passion
25 Jul 192625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
26 Jul 194746.6AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
7 Oct 194746.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
11 Nov 195251.9DiedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
15 Mar 1998Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Vincent Eugène Bossilkov (Bossilkoff)
Bishop Bl. Vincent Eugène Bossilkov (Bossilkoff) C.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Nicopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelene
Death PlacePrison, Sofia

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • bp/bd/ob/d/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast