Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Unverified Bishop Zhang Tongli]

Episcopal Ordination Unverified

Not in Union with the Holy See

Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note/Previous Titular See: (not recognized by Rome or Beijing)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1968 Born
1997²28.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Dec 199931.2Ordained BishopBishop of Shanghai [Shanghai], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Zhang Tongli
Bishop Zhang Tongli (born ) Bishop of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Dec 2019
  • b: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 86
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast