Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jean Trần Xun Hạp

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vinh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1920Born
1 Feb 195938.3Ordained PriestPriest of Vinh, Viet Nam
10 Jan 197958.2AppointedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
4 Mar 197958.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
11 Dec 200080.1RetiredBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
6 Jul 200584.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean Trần Xun Hạp
Bishop Pierre-Jean Trần Xun Hạp (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vinh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNhn-Ha

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,972
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast