Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Marie Nguyn Quang Tuyn

Deceased

Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1945Born
16 Sep 197428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
15 Dec 198843.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
25 Jan 198943.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
23 Mar 199448.5SucceededBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam
23 Sep 200661.0DiedBishop of Bắc Ninh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Nguyn Quang Tuyn
Bishop Joseph Marie Nguyn Quang Tuyn (born , died ) Bishop of Bắc Ninh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDai Lam

  • a priest for 32.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,270
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast