Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Marie Ðinh Bỉnh

Deceased

Bishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1923Born
10 Jun 196037.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 197956.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
8 Dec 197956.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
7 Jun 198259.0SucceededBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam
14 Mar 198965.8DiedBishop of Thi Bnh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Marie Ðinh Bỉnh
Bishop Joseph Marie Ðinh Bỉnh (born , died ) Bishop of Thi Bnh

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhu-Nhai

  • a priest for 28.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast