Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Antoine-Marie-Nicolas Daveluy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Akka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1818Born
18 Dec 184123.7Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Nov 185537.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Corea
13 Nov 185537.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Akka
25 Mar 185739.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Akka
8 Mar 186647.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Corea
30 Mar 186648.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea
6 Oct 1968Beatified
6 May 1984Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Antoine-Marie-Nicolas Daveluy (VIAF: 12297314)
Bishop St. Antoine-Marie-Nicolas Daveluy M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmiens, Diocese of Amiens, France, France

  • a priest for 24.2 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 71
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Jan 2017