Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florent Daguin, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1815Born
1837¹21.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
21 Dec 183924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
2 Mar 184732.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
2 Mar 184732.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
25 Jul 184833.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
11 Jul 185742.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
9 May 185944.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Florent Daguin
Bishop Florent Daguin C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Mongolia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaujeu, France

  • a priest for 19.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017