Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Carnevali (Carnevale), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China

Titular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1830¹Born
27 Sep 187040.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China
27 Sep 187040.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia
19 May 187242.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maximianopolis in Arabia
23 May 187545.3DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Carnevali (Carnevale)
Bishop Paolo Carnevali (Carnevale) O.F.M. Obs. (born 1830, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFresonara, Diocese of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
Death PlaceLuanfu

  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 374
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,872, Number 68
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast