Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent de Paul Pham Van Du

Deceased

Bishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1922Born
8 Sep 194825.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 196037.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lang Sn et Cao Bang, Viet Nam
5 Mar 196037.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Boseta
24 Nov 196038.1AppointedBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
1 Mar 197956.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam
2 Sep 199875.8DiedBishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Vincent de Paul Pham Van Du
Bishop Vincent de Paul Pham Van Du (born , died ) Bishop of Lạng Sơn et Cao Bằng

EventPlace
Birth PlacePht Dim

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,582
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018