Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Bíró

Bishop of Hungary, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1950 Born
23 Jun 197423.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pécs, Hungary
18 Apr 199443.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét, Hungary
18 Apr 199443.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
21 May 199443.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Galbae
20 Nov 200858.0AppointedBishop of Hungary, Military

MicroData Summary for László Bíró
Bishop László Bíró (born ) Bishop of Hungary, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzekszárd

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Hungary, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,322
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast