Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Balázs Bábel

Archbishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1950 Born
19 Jun 197625.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 199948.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét, Hungary
10 Apr 199948.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét, Hungary
25 Jun 199948.6SucceededArchbishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Balázs Bábel
Archbishop Balázs Bábel (born ) Archbishop of Kalocsa-Kecskemét

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGyón

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kalocsa-Kecskemét.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,496
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018