Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ildebrando Vannucci, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

Titular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1890Born
1 Nov 191121.4ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Mar 191524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Jul 192939.1AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
30 Jun 194252.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
2 Aug 194252.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
22 Aug 195565.2DiedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ildebrando Vannucci
Bishop Ildebrando Vannucci O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,942, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast