Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Fiori

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy

Titular Bishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1874Born
31 Mar 190631.8Ordained PriestPriest of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
19 Jun 194369.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy
19 Jun 194369.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Palmyra
26 Jul 194369.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Palmyra
4 Aug 194874.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy
4 Mar 196287.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fiori
Bishop Domenico Fiori (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMompeo

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,566
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast