Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptist Wang Tseng-yi (Uamzemi), C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Anguo [Ankwo]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1884BornTsingyuan
190823.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
18 Mar 191126.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
1 Jul 193753.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo], China
1 Jul 193753.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamia
24 Feb 193853.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamia
11 Apr 194661.9AppointedBishop of Anguo [Ankwo], China
21 Feb 195166.8DiedBishop of Anguo [Ankwo], China

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Wang Tseng-yi (Uamzemi):
Bishop John Baptist Wang Tseng-yi (Uamzemi) C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Anguo [Ankwo]

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013