Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Anguo [Ankwo]

Dioecesis Ngancuovensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, SiKuan, Anguo, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lihsien
15 April 1924ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Lihsien (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo]
13 July 1929ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lihsien Vicariate Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo]
Diocese of Anguo [Ankwo]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ankwo [Anguo] Diocese of Anguo [Ankwo]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Anguo [Ankwo]
194933,2001,200,0002.8%23231,44311611111ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 20 Oct 2012