Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wojciech Skibicki

Auxiliary Bishop of Elbląg, Poland

Titular Bishop of Casae Nigrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1970 Born
10 Jun 199525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Elbląg, Poland
14 Feb 201948.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Elbląg, Poland
14 Feb 201948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
6 Apr 201948.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Skibicki
Bishop Wojciech Skibicki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Elbląg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkrwilno, Diocese of Płock
Ordained BishopSw. Mikolaj, Cathedral, Elbląg, Diocese of Elbląg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Elbląg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2019
  • ob: CB, 15 Feb 2019
  • c2+: CB, 29 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,130

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 24 Apr 2019

Quantcast