Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Józef Sliwinski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1939BornWerblinia
17 Dec 196122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 May 198647.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 May 198647.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arindela
15 Jun 198647.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arindela
25 Mar 199253.2AppointedBishop of Elbląg, Poland
2 Aug 200364.6ResignedBishop of Elbląg, Poland
9 Sep 200970.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Elbląg, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Józef Sliwinski:
Bishop Andrzej Józef Sliwinski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Elbląg

  • a priest for 47.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013