Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Shi Chunjie

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1920³Born
23 Jun 194727.4Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 198767.2Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China
3 Nov 199171.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan], China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Shi Chunjie
Bishop Paul Shi Chunjie (born Jan 1920, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

EventPlace
Death PlacePrison

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,108
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 44
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,471
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast