Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maria Phạm Năng Tĩnh

Deceased

Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1917Born
4 Aug 194528.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 196042.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
5 Mar 196042.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Berenice
10 Nov 196043.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berenice
24 Nov 196043.3AppointedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
11 Feb 197456.5DiedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Phạm Năng Tĩnh
Bishop Joseph Maria Phạm Năng Tĩnh (born , died ) Bishop of Bi Chu

EventPlace
Ordained BishopBi Chu, Vicariate Apostolic of Bi Chu

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1960, Number 122
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,444

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 31 Mar 2020

Quantcast