Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Meng Zi Wen (Meng Jieren; Mong Zi Wen)

Deceased

Bishop of Nanning [Nanning], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1904Born
12 Apr 193531.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nanning [Nanning], China
24 Feb 198479.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nanning [Nanning], China
7 Jan 2007102.8DiedBishop of Nanning [Nanning], China

MicroData Summary for Joseph Meng Zi Wen (Meng Jieren; Mong Zi Wen)
Bishop Joseph Meng Zi Wen (Meng Jieren; Mong Zi Wen) (born , died ) Bishop of Nanning [Nanning]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHengling
Death PlaceNanning, Archdiocese of Nanning [Nanning]

  • a priest for 71.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Epsicopal Ordinations in China, Year 2,018, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast