Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprien Mbuka Di Nkuanga, C.I.C.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1943 Born
27 Aug 197228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
21 Apr 199753.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Apr 199753.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
19 Oct 199753.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
13 Mar 200157.3AppointedBishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Mar 202177.3RetiredBishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Cyprien Mbuka Di Nkuanga
Bishop Cyprien Mbuka Di Nkuanga C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Boma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKizu
Ordained BishopNotre Dame du Congo, Cathedral, Boma, Diocese of Boma

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Boma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,161
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021
  • ln: CB, 24 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jun 2021

Quantcast