Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tshumbe

Dioecesis Tshumbeensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Nicolas Djomo Lola, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 November 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kananga
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Congo, The Democratic Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 60,000 (23,175 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Diocese de Tshumbe, B.P. 1800 Kinshasa 1, Gombe, Rep. Democratique du Congo
  • Telephone: (081)215.37.73
  • Fax: (088)44.948

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Tshumbe
25 May 1936ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Kasaļ Superiore Prefecture Apostolic of Tshumbe (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tshumbe
14 March 1947ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tshumbe Vicariate Apostolic of Tshumbe
Diocese of Tshumbe
10 November 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tshumbe Diocese of Tshumbe

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Tshumbe
195031,808180,00017.7%333368834129ap1951
Diocese of Tshumbe
196958,500300,00019.5%1023331,772435713ap1971
1980122,500468,00026.2%188264,711247115ap1981
1990178,500572,00031.2%426483,718349817ap1991
1994225,000680,00033.1%524564,0173010318ap2000
1999225,000680,00033.1%577643,5153111218ap2003
2003231,200680,00034.0%586643,6122612619ap2004
2004331,353683,28848.5%586645,1772812919ap2005
2010382,000779,00049.0%667735,2323416520ap2011
2014426,000866,00049.2%765815,2593219720ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_d, v3.0.9, 4 May 2015; Data: 3 Jun 2015