Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert Tembo Nlandu, C.I.C.M.

Bishop of Budjala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1962 BornNganda Kikamba
25 Aug 199128.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
26 Mar 200744.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
3 Jun 200744.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Oct 200947.0SucceededBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Philibert Tembo Nlandu:
Bishop Philibert Tembo Nlandu C.I.C.M. (born ) Bishop of Budjala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Budjala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,429
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013