Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Bolangi Egwanga Ediba Tasame

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1937Born
6 Jan 196628.0Ordained PriestPriest of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Jan 197436.0AppointedBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
14 Jul 197436.5Ordained BishopBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
22 Oct 200971.8ResignedBishop of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Jul 201981.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Budjala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Bolangi Egwanga Ediba Tasame
Bishop Joseph Bolangi Egwanga Ediba Tasame (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Budjala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbaya
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopBudjala, Diocese of Budjala
Death PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

  • a priest for 53.4 years
  • a bishop for 44.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast