Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Lebel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valleyfield, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1924BornTrois-Pistoles (Rivière-du-Loup)
18 Jun 195025.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 197449.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Québec, Québec, Canada
11 Mar 197449.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Alinda
12 May 197449.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alinda
26 Mar 197651.3AppointedBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
2 May 197651.4InstalledBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
30 Jun 200075.6RetiredBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
25 May 201590.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Robert Lebel:
Bishop Robert Lebel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valleyfield

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 27 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015