Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Berthelet, C.S.V. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1934Born
1 Aug 195722.7ProfessedMember of Clerics of Saint Viator
15 Aug 196126.8Solemn VowsMember of Clerics of Saint Viator
16 Jun 196227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics of Saint Viator
26 Aug 198449.8AppointedSuperior General of Clerics of Saint Viator
19 Dec 198652.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
19 Dec 198652.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
21 Mar 198752.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
27 Dec 199662.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
25 Jan 199762.2InstalledBishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
28 Oct 201076.0RetiredBishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
25 Jan 201984.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jacques Berthelet
(VIAF: 106000110; WikiData: Q1677900)
Bishop Jacques Berthelet C.S.V. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jean-Longueuil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained PriestSaint-Viateur, Church, Outremont, PQ, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-l'Évangéliste, Co-Cathedral, Saint-Jean-sur-Richelieu, Diocese of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec
Death PlaceViatorian infirmary, Joliette, Diocese of Joliette, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Crypt of Bishops, Cathedral, Saint-Jean-sur-Richelieu, Diocese of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2010
  • d: CB, 26 Jan 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,878
  • sole/c1: CB, 12 Jul 2022
  • b: Dictionnaire Biographique des Évèques Catholiques du Canada, Page 254, and Page 255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 6 Dec 2022