Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Hamelin

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Apollonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1951 Born
3 Dec 197726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
22 Dec 201564.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada
22 Dec 201564.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
18 Mar 201664.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia

MicroData Summary for Claude Hamelin
Bishop Claude Hamelin (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSherrington
Ordained BishopSt-Jean l’Evangéliste, Cathedral, St-Jean-sur-Richelieu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Jean-Longueuil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 6 Jan 2016
  • c4: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,864
  • bp: CB, 2 Aug 2017
  • by: CB, 8 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Aug 2017