Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lionel Gendron, P.S.S.

Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1944 BornSaint-Quintin
31 May 196925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
197025.6ProfessedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
11 Feb 200661.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Feb 200661.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagase
25 Mar 200661.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tagase
28 Oct 201066.4AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Lionel Gendron:
Bishop Lionel Gendron P.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-Longueuil

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Jean-Longueuil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,099
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013