Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christian Lépine

Archbishop of Montréal, Québec


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1951 BornMontréal
7 Sep 198332.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Jul 201159.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
11 Jul 201159.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Zabi
10 Sep 201160.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zabi
20 Mar 201260.5AppointedArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
20 Mar 201260.5InstalledArchbishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Christian Lépine:
Archbishop Christian Lépine (born ) Archbishop of Montréal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montréal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 15 Jul 2011
  • c2+: CB, 8 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,138
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2012
  • i: CB, 20 Mar 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013