Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benito Gennaro Franceschetti

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1935Born
17 Apr 196024.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 199762.0AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
31 Aug 199762.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
4 Feb 200569.6DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benito Gennaro Franceschetti
Archbishop Benito Gennaro Franceschetti (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvaglio d'Iseo

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,039
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018