Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Gontrand Décoste, S.J.

Bishop of Jérémie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1957 BornSaint Jean du Sud
1 Jul 198427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Les Cayes, Haïti
199840.6ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
6 Aug 200952.2AppointedBishop of Jérémie, Haïti
18 Oct 200952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jérémie, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Joseph Gontrand Décoste:
Bishop Joseph Gontrand Décoste S.J. (born ) Bishop of Jérémie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jérémie.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015