Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-André Dumas

Bishop of Anse-à-Veau et Miragoâne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1962 BornSaint-Jean du Sud
26 May 199128.7Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
10 Dec 200240.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
10 Dec 200240.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Floriana
22 Feb 200340.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Floriana
13 Jul 200845.8AppointedBishop of Anse-à-Veau et Miragoâne, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Pierre-André Dumas:
Bishop Pierre-André Dumas (born ) Bishop of Anse-à-Veau et Miragoâne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Anse-à-Veau et Miragoâne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013