Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Amadio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1913BornMontedinove
25 Jul 193622.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 196753.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
11 Apr 196753.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forconium
11 Jun 196753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forconium
28 Jun 197157.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
29 Jan 197258.4SucceededBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
14 May 198066.7AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
30 Sep 198976.0RetiredBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
15 Jul 200086.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Amadio:
Bishop Francesco Amadio (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore)

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013