Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia

Dioecesis Interamnensis-Narniensis-Amerina



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Piemontese, O.F.M. Conv., Bishop
  • Vincenzo Paglia, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 871 (336 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Umbria
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.terni.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza Duomo 11, 05100 Terni, Italia
  • Telephone: 0744.54.65.11
  • Fax: 0744.54.65.54

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Terni
353ErectedDiocese of Terni (erected)
570SuppressedDiocese of Terni (suppressed) Diocese of Spoleto
Diocese of Terni
1217RestoredDiocese of Spoleto Diocese of Terni
Diocese of Terni e Narni
12 April 1907UnitedDiocese of Narni
Diocese of Terni
Diocese of Terni e Narni
Diocese of Terni, Narni, e Amelia
13 September 1983UnitedDiocese of Amelia
Diocese of Terni e Narni
Diocese of Terni, Narni, e Amelia
Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Terni, Narni, e Amelia Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Terni
188616,971.0%40016OTC
Diocese of Terni e Narni
1950104,700105,00099.7%55511069874726961ap1951
1970132,500133,80099.0%43671101,2047565ap1971
1980142,900144,10099.2%5240921,55324715068ap1981
Diocese of Terni, Narni, e Amelia
Diocese of Terni-Narni-Amelia
1990161,400163,42398.8%78471251,29175413481ap1991
1999160,000163,00098.2%94441381,159114615381ap2000
2000160,000163,00098.2%94441381,159114615381ap2001
2001162,000163,40099.1%81491301,246175015981ap2002
2002162,000163,40099.1%95421371,182174215981ap2003
2003162,000163,40099.1%85451301,24618462181ap2004
2004162,000163,40099.1%93461391,165274710381ap2005
2010156,100157,90098.9%96441401,11524469582ap2011
2014161,600169,99195.1%91371281,26223378182ap2015
2017163,900167,00098.1%83361191,37723366582ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Terni
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 285
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 168
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 210
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228, and Page 229
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast