Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Saraceni, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Sep 1276AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
25 Feb 1286AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
14 Feb 1287AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
16 Jul 1295³DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Saraceni
Bishop Pietro Saraceni O.P. (died ) Bishop of Vicenza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 526, and Page 346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Jul 2021

Quantcast