Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teofil Józef Wilski

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz, Poland

Titular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1935 Born
11 Jun 196024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
8 Apr 199559.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalisz, Poland
8 Apr 199559.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
8 May 199559.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum in Mauretania
31 Oct 201176.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Kalisz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teofil Józef Wilski
Bishop Teofil Józef Wilski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Kalisz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkubarczewo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalisz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018