Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Vorrath

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

Titular Bishop of Vicus Aterii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1937 BornEssen-Stoppenberg
26 Jul 196225.0Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
22 Nov 199558.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
22 Nov 199558.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Aterii
7 Jan 199658.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Aterii
14 Mar 201476.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Vorrath:
Bishop Franz Vorrath (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Essen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,655
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Mar 2014