Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Grave

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

Titular Bishop of Tingaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1932 BornEssen
2 Feb 195926.2Ordained PriestPriest of Essen, Germany
31 Mar 198855.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany
31 Mar 198855.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Tingaria
3 May 198855.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tingaria
27 Jun 200875.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Essen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Grave:
Bishop Franz Grave (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Essen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Essen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,719
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 14 Mar 2014