Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paschal Sweeney, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1912Born
11 Jul 193522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
20 Sep 196350.7AppointedPrefect of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
15 Nov 196653.9AppointedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
25 Jan 196754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
22 Sep 197966.7ResignedBishop of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea
1 Sep 198168.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Vanimo, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Paschal Sweeney
Bishop Paschal Sweeney C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vanimo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWoodville, Australia

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018