Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Reuben Edward Thomas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bathurst, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1908Born
30 Nov 193123.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 196354.9AppointedBishop of Bathurst, Australia
20 Oct 196354.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bathurst, Australia
12 Apr 198374.4RetiredBishop of Bathurst, Australia
24 Sep 198374.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Bathurst, Australia

MicroData Summary for Albert Reuben Edward Thomas
Bishop Albert Reuben Edward Thomas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bathurst

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFarnborough, Great Britain

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017