Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patrício Cardinal da Silva, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1756BornPinheiros
21 Dec 178024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
3 May 181962.5SelectedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
21 Feb 182063.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
30 Apr 182063.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Évora, Portugal
27 Sep 182467.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 182669.2SelectedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
13 Mar 182669.4ConfirmedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 Jan 184083.2DiedPatriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Patrício da Silva
Patrício Cardinal da Silva O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Patriarch of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
  • a cardinal for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1824
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 185, and Page 242
  • bd: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 May 2016