Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Alexandre Lobo, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1763Born
23 Mar 178723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 May 182056.6AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
16 Jul 182056.7Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
9 Sep 184480.9DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Francisco Alexandre Lobo
Bishop Francisco Alexandre Lobo O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeja

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,148
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 398
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1820, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017