Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Pinto Ribeiro Seixas

Deceased

Bishop of Bragança e Miranda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1717BornVilla Franca
14 Feb 177355.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Mar 177355.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jun 177355.6SelectedBishop of Bragança, Portugal
12 Jul 177355.7ConfirmedBishop of Bragança, Portugal
10 Oct 177356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança, Portugal
27 Sep 178062.9AppointedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal
9 Sep 179274.9DiedBishop of Bragança e Miranda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Pinto Ribeiro Seixas:
Bishop Bernardo Pinto Ribeiro Seixas (born , died ) Bishop of Bragança e Miranda

  • a priest for 19.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Dec 2015