Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hernando Eusebio Oscot y Colombres, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China

Titular Bishop of Evaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1694Born
1 Oct 173743.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China
1 Oct 173743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Evaria
10 May 173945.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Evaria
28 Nov 174349.7DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu), China

MicroData Summary for Hernando Eusebio Oscot y Colombres
Bishop Hernando Eusebio Oscot y Colombres O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Fukien (Kuiceu)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Llanas, Diocese of Oviedo, Spain

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 57, Number 257
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast