Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alojzy Orszulik, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Łowicz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1928Born
22 Jun 195729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
8 Sep 198961.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Siedlce, Poland
8 Sep 198961.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
8 Dec 198961.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
25 Mar 199263.7AppointedBishop of Łowicz, Poland
12 Apr 199263.8InstalledBishop of Łowicz, Poland
27 Mar 200475.7RetiredBishop of Łowicz, Poland
21 Feb 201990.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Łowicz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Alojzy Orszulik
Bishop Alojzy Orszulik S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Łowicz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaranowice Śląskie, Diocese of Katowice
Ordained PriestOur Lady Queen of Apostles, Church, Ożarow Mazowiecki, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Siedlce, Diocese of Siedlce
Death PlaceŁowicz, Diocese of Łowicz
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Łowicz, Diocese of Łowicz

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,777
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Feb 2019
  • loc: CB, 22 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 2 Mar 2019

Quantcast