Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Franciszek Dziuba

Bishop of Łowicz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1950 BornPleszew
21 Jun 197524.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
27 Mar 200453.5AppointedBishop of Łowicz, Poland
22 May 200453.6Ordained BishopBishop of Łowicz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Franciszek Dziuba:
Bishop Andrzej Franciszek Dziuba (born ) Bishop of Łowicz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Łowicz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,598
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013