Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nguyễn Ðình Nhiên

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Gisipa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1895Born
2 Apr 192731.4Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 196367.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
5 Feb 196367.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
15 Mar 196367.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
24 Mar 196973.4DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyễn Ðình Nhiên
Bishop Paul Nguyễn Ðình Nhiên (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Vinh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTho Hoang

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast