Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Czeslaw Lewandowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Titular Bishop of Fidoloma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1922Born
18 Jun 195027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Feb 197350.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Feb 197350.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
1 Apr 197350.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fidoloma
6 Dec 199775.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Aug 200987.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Czeslaw Lewandowski
Bishop Czeslaw Lewandowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKolo

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018